First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |