Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: May 31, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Randolf Staab was charged with the following offences:
1. Sexual Assault, on or about August 3, 2019, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Assault, on or about November 29, 2020, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: March 9, 2022
Place of Charge: City of Brampton
Peel Regional Police
Source:
Other
Active Date: May 31, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On March 1, 2022, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Randolf Staab:
1. Must notify the Police within 48 hours of any change of address, employment.
2. Must not communicate directly or indirectly with named people except in accordance with specified conditions.
3. Must not go to a named place except in accordance with specified conditions.
4. Must not enter the areas where named person is known to be.
5. Must not possess a firearm, crossbow, prohibited weapon, restricted weapon, prohibited device, ammunition, prohibited ammunition or explosive substance, and must surrender those that are already in their possession and also any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling them to acquire or possess them to Police.