Stein, Robert Ian (CPSO#: 74806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8139
Fax: (519) 685-8105
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mangel Stein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stein ( CPSO# 74806 )
Dr. J. Mangel ( CPSO# 70709 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8139

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN STEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2002