Rabah, Rola Saiid Abdullah (CPSO#: 74021)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004