Rabbat, George Raymond (CPSO#: 81633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Lebanese University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone: (807) 223-8200
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Rabbat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rabbat ( CPSO# 81633 )

Business Address:
Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone Number: (807) 223-4994

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE RAYMOND RABBAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABBAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2004 to 01 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 19 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008