Rabideau, Sparrow Lee (CPSO#: 51455)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 800 - 723 Rymal Rd W Hamilton, On L9B 2W2
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact Dr Christine O'Connor at the address above.
Date Received: 25 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018