Rabinovitch, Gerald Irving (CPSO#: 63455)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Filebank 488 Carlingview drive Etobicoke ON M9W 6M8 4167981404
Date Received: 09 Aug 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gerald Irving Rabinovitch to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 22, 2016:

Dr. Rabinovitch was the subject of two College investigations into whether he committed professional misconduct, including allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and that he engaged in inappropriate sexual conduct with a patient and/or a former patient. In the face of these allegations and the College’s investigations, Dr. Rabinovitch resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)