Rachlis, Alisa Cheryl (CPSO#: 86652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kindercare Pediatrics
Suite 301-491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
Galaxy 12 Clinic - Paediatric Rheum
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alisa Rachlis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rachlis ( CPSO# 86652 )

Business Address:
Kindercare Pediatrics
Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
Galaxy 12 Clinic-Paediatric Rheumatology
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7476

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 29 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISA CHERYL RACHLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACHLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2013