Racicovschi, Daria Sanda (CPSO#: 79778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4403
Fax: (905) 721-4780
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARIA SANDA RACICOVSCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACICOVSCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 18 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 19 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 25 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012