Radan, Aleksandar (CPSO#: 73584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandria Marine & General Hospita
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: (519) 524-8522
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Radan ( CPSO# 73584 )

Business Address:
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEKSANDAR RADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2007