Radford, Charles Joseph (CPSO#: 18327)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 27 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1971
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 27 Mar 2018