Radhakrishnan, Arun Kumar (CPSO#: 72771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 Terminal Avenue
Unit B22
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Fax: (613) 731-4979
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

210 Melrose Avenue
Grimes Lodge - Main Floor
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & D Radhakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Radhakrishnan ( CPSO# 77992 )
Dr. A. Radhakrishnan ( CPSO# 72771 )

Business Address:
Grimes Lodge Building
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4334

Business Address:
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Suite W1402
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2824

Business Address:
550 Terminal Avenue
Suite B22
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone Number: (613) 731-4770

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARUN KUMAR RADHAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002