Radhakrishnan, Dhenuka Kannan (CPSO#: 77992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Tennankore, Dhenuka Kannan (used until: 21 Jun 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cheo
Room W1402
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2824
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A & D Radhakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Radhakrishnan ( CPSO# 77992 )
Dr. A. Radhakrishnan ( CPSO# 72771 )

Business Address:
Grimes Lodge Building
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4334

Business Address:
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Suite W1402
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2824

Business Address:
550 Terminal Avenue
Suite B22
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone Number: (613) 731-4770

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHENUKA KANNAN RADHAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2008