Radhakrishnan, Seetha (CPSO#: 87029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Nephrology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 201700
Fax: (416) 813-6271
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seetha Radhakrishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Radhakrishnan ( CPSO# 87029 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Nephrology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEETHA RADHAKRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008