Radigan, Jordan Paul (CPSO#: 89424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nova Southeastern University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Dr.
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2867
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Radigan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Radigan ( CPSO# 89424 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN PAUL RADIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2014