Radin, Daniel Aurel (CPSO#: 80163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103A
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 979-4000
Fax: (519) 979-5777
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Radin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Radin ( CPSO# 80163 )

Business Address:
Suite 103A - 103B
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-4000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 31 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL AUREL RADIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2004