Radovanovic, Ivan (CPSO#: 89712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2013

Expiry Date:  22 Jan 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jan 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Serbian

Education:University of Geneva, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
University of Toronto
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6207
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016


Corporation Name: Dr. Ivan Radovanovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Radovanovic ( CPSO# 89712 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
4th Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6207

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Switzerland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 23 Jan 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ivan Radovanovic may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Neurosurgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Radovanovic holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Radovanovic  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Radovanovic's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Radovanovic's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on January 23, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 22, 2020.