Radwi, Mansoor Rashidhaider K (CPSO#: 90421)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Urdu

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017