Rady, Sherif Rifat Morsi Mohamed (CPSO#: 90024)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alexandria, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2008 to 06 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013