Rae, Jennifer Anne (CPSO#: 81326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
993 Princess Street
Suite 212
Kingston ON  K7L 1H3
Phone: (613) 900-2344
Fax: (613) 900-1964
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Rae Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rae ( CPSO# 81326 )

Business Address:
212 - 993 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 7H3
Phone Number: (613) 484-0178

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE RAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 14 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010