Raffa, Enass Hassan M (CPSO#: 110819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENASS HASSAN M RAFFA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RAFFA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. RAFFA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAFFA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RAFFA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RAFFA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RAFFA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2016 to 23 Oct 2016
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018