Raghavan, Gita (CPSO#: 97841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GITA RAGHAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHAVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017