Raghig, Abdulhakim Mohamed (CPSO#: 80570)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 15 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2004 to 22 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2009