Ragos, Glenn Anthony (CPSO#: 71421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. Sean Rice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 391-4048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Cumberland Clinic
225-162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M3R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-0113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
200-4610 HIghway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Glenn Ragos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ragos ( CPSO# 71421 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
Dr. Sean Rice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 391-4048

Business Address:
The Cumberland Clinic
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M3R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Business Address:
Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
4610 Hwy 7
Suite 200
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN ANTHONY RAGOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002