Raha, Ronjon Neil (CPSO#: 75056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5776
Fax: (905) 813-3042
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Raha ( CPSO# 75056 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
Milton Diagnostic Services
480 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9A9
Phone Number: (905) 878-8831

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-0653

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONJON NEIL RAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2005