Rahal, Hussain Ahmad (CPSO#: 61011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2081 Merivale Road
Unit 1300
Ottawa ON  K2G 1G9
Phone: (613) 739-3044
Fax: (613) 739-4995
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1131A leslie street
unit 300
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Canada
Phone: 14163607360
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rahal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rahal ( CPSO# 61011 )

Business Address:
Suite 1300
2081 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 1G9
Phone Number: (613) 739-3044


Corporation Name: H. Rahal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rahal ( CPSO# 61011 )

Business Address:
Suite 1300
2081 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 1G9
Phone Number: (613) 739-3044

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSSAIN AHMAD RAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990