Rahal, Sherine (CPSO#: 93160)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2017