Rahalkar, Amit Ramesh (CPSO#: 93016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
120 Vidal Street North
Suite #2
Sarnia, Ontario
N7T 5X5
Sarnia ON  N7T 5X5
Phone: 519-332-5959
Fax: 519-337-0975
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Rahalkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahalkar ( CPSO# 93016 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
120 Vidal Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5X5
Phone Number: (519) 332-5959

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIT RAMESH RAHALKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHALKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018