Raheel, Erum (CPSO#: 85484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 100
1501 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 4T6
Phone: (416) 439-0163
Fax: (416) 439-7609
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Campus health Centre
2000 Simcoe street N
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 721-3037
Fax: (905) 721-3133
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Erum Raheel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Raheel ( CPSO# 85484 )

Business Address:
Units 1 - 4
2060 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 439-2273

Business Address:
2000 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1H 7L4
Phone Number: (905) 721-3037

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERUM RAHEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHEEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007