Rahimi, Abdulwali Samad (CPSO#: 94422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Farsi, Hindi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:Marathwada University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand Family Health Organization
Haldimand FHT Clinic
75 Parkview Road Suite 4
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone: (289) 524-0053
Fax: (289) 283-3029
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Haldimand General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Canada
Phone: 289-523-0053
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdulwali Samad Rahimi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rahimi ( CPSO# 94422 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
75 Parkview Lane
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (289) 524-0053

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Oklahoma
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Abdulwali  Samad  Rahimi  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine.