Rahimi-Darabad, Mehdi (CPSO#: 82826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
679 Davis Drive, Suite 307
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 235-6561
Fax: (905) 235-6768
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehdi Rahimi-Darabad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rahimi-Darabad ( CPSO# 82826 )

Business Address:
Southlake Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
679 Davis Drive
Suite 307
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 235-6561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHDI RAHIMI-DARABAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHIMI-DARABAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010