Rahman, Asad Ur (CPSO#: 85193)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2006 to 23 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010