Rahman, Riffat Ur (CPSO#: 80229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 117
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 258-2553
Fax: (519) 252-2857
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rahman ( CPSO# 80229 )

Business Address:
117 - 700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V2
Phone Number: (519) 254-7979

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RIFFAT UR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2004 to 21 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008