Rahman, Sajjad-Ur (CPSO#: 68642)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Peshawar, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997