Rahman, Sana (CPSO#: 90999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham HealthPlex
A2B - 5995 14th Ave
Markham ON  L3S 4S1
Phone: 2898599901
Fax: 9052016565
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANA RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011