Rahmdel, Behnam (CPSO#: 95656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Names: Rod, Behnam (used until: 09 Jan 2013 )     Rahmdel, Behnam (used until: 15 Aug 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9-9080 Yonge St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone: (905) 763-9400
Fax: (905) 763-9600
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rahmdel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rahmdel ( CPSO# 95656 )

Business Address:
9 - 9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (905) 763-9400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEHNAM RAHMDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMDEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2015