Rainville, Ginette Diane Marie (CPSO#: 82499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Real Med Corp
Family Medical Centre
101 Joseph Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 8C9
Phone: (613) 732-6662
Fax: (613) 732-6666
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CFB Petawawa
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Canada
Phone: 613-687-5511
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uttley Rainville Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Uttley ( CPSO# 82583 )
Dr. G. Rainville ( CPSO# 82499 )

Business Address:
Real Med Corp
Family Medical Centre
101 Joseph Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 8C9
Phone Number: (613) 732-6662

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GINETTE DIANE MARIE RAINVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAINVILLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007