Raizman, Igal (CPSO#: 100416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Victory 3 Room 305
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7661
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IGAL RAIZMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAIZMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018