Raja, Jamila Bano (CPSO#: 77522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331 Ext. 1311
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JB Raja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Raja ( CPSO# 77522 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
42 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMILA BANO RAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2005