Raja, Sumaira Jamal (CPSO#: 85044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9615
Fax: (905) 336-9650
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit B6-10635 creditview Rd
Brampton ON  L7A 0T4
Canada
Phone: (905) 495-6555
Fax: (905) 495-9145
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sumaira J. Raja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Raja ( CPSO# 85044 )

Business Address:
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 567-3195

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMAIRA JAMAL RAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History