Rajamanickam, Sendhan Amudhan (CPSO#: 85507)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2006 to 02 Nov 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2006 to 16 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2007 to 16 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2008 to 16 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2017