Rajaram, Mahadevan (CPSO#: 80008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Chennai 600085
India
Phone: 43968702

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHADEVAN RAJARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJARAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Jul 2003 to 20 Aug 2003
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010