Rajarathinam, Manikandan (CPSO#: 94009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SJHC Pain clinic, 268 Grosvenor st,
St Joseph's Hospital
London, ON.
London ON  N6A4V2
Phone: (519) 646 6100 Ext. 61786
Fax: (519) 646-6219
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital, LHSC
London ON  N6A5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685 8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manikandan Rajarathinam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rajarathinam ( CPSO# 94009 )

Business Address:
LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C3-125
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 17 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 01 Jun 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Manikandan Rajarathinam may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anesthesia   and  Perioperative  Medicine,  University  of  Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Rajarathinam holds an academic appointment at
                        the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Rajarathinam no longer holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Rajarathinam's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision about  Dr.  Rajarathinam's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2017, and expires on June 30, 2020.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Rajarathinam's academic appointment at the University
                  of  Western  Ontario,  the  expiry  date  can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.