Rajesan, Ratheishan (CPSO#: 89449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Academic
Family Health Centre
1125 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2Y5
Phone: (416) 264-4446
Fax: (416) 264-4456
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ratheishan Rajesan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rajesan ( CPSO# 89449 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Academic
Family Health Centre
1125 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2Y5
Phone Number: (416) 264-4446

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RATHEISHAN RAJESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJESAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010