Raju, Dharmapaul Lakshmana (CPSO#: 87756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Hospital Bench Trail
Trail BC  V1R 4M1
Phone: (250) 368-3311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Arkansas
USA - California
USA - Georgia
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHARMAPAUL LAKSHMANA RAJU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2014