Rakhshani, Nasimeh (CPSO#: 93212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASIMEH RAKHSHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAKHSHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012