Rakovitch, Eileen (CPSO#: 61022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre ( T Wing)
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4834
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 4167566704
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Fleshner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rakovitch ( CPSO# 61022 )
Dr. N. Fleshner ( CPSO# 59628 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 3-130
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2899


Corporation Name: Eileen Rakovitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rakovitch ( CPSO# 61022 )

Business Address:
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room T2 152
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4974

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EILEEN RAKOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAKOVITCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1991