Ram, Ganesh Harirama (CPSO#: 86064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Tamil

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone: (519) 601-7171
Fax: (519) 601-7174
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 110, 525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M5E2
Canada
Phone: 5196219257
Fax: 5192088182
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

13158 Tecumseh Road East, Suite 4
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 948-0766
Fax: (519) 948-2681
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ganesh Ram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ram ( CPSO# 86064 )

Business Address:
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
270 Riddell Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 6N6
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Business Address:
3955 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GANESH HARIRAMA RAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Apr 2007 to 07 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007