Ramachandran Nair, Rajesh (CPSO#: 81553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3A- Pediatrics (Neurology)
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75613
Fax: (905) 521-7914
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramachandran Nair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ramachandran Nair ( CPSO# 81553 )

Business Address:
Suite 3A - Pediatrics (Neurology)
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Aug 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Rajesh Ramachandran Nair may practise medicine independently in Paediatric
            Neurology, only.