Ramachandran, Sumitha (CPSO#: 77674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: Krishnamoorthy, Sumitha (used until: 07 Apr 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Walkley Medical Centre
1852 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z8
Phone: (613) 526-5200
Fax: (613) 526-5207
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 305
150 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 8H2
Canada
Phone: (613) 744-4978
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Ramachandran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ramachandran ( CPSO# 77674 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 8H6
Phone Number: (613) 853-2525

Business Address:
1852 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 7Z8
Phone Number: (613) 526-5200

Business Address:
305 - 150 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 8H2
Phone Number: (613) 744-4978

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMITHA RAMACHANDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMACHANDRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004